Nelson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Nelson
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Hyundai Capital America, Inc., Spire Credit Union and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00092
Filed: January 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Spire Credit Union is DISMISSED with prejudice from this matter. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 03/11/2019. (LLM)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Spire Credit Union #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Chester, Anthony)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Taylor Nelson (Chester, Anthony)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank is GRANTED an extension of time until and including March 18, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/13/2019. (KAT)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Wells Fargo & Co. (Hoffman, Erin) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (AKL).
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation. (Hoffman, Erin)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Taylor Nelson. (Hoffman, Erin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Hyundai Capital America, Inc., Spire Credit Union, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (lmb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-92 (PAM/KMM). (lmb)
January 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6603513) filed by Taylor Nelson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Nelson
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Capital America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spire Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Erin L Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?