City of Apple Valley v. Koppers Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Apple Valley
Defendant: Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Koppers Inc., Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Beazer East, Inc., Stella-Jones Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., The Brewer Company, Bonsal American, Inc. and Vance Brothers, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00119
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
3 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/6/2019. (MSK)
March 6, 2019 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Stella-Jones Inc., The Brewer Company, Vance Brothers, Inc.. (KNK)
March 6, 2019 Filing 53 Summons Issued as to Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Stella-Jones Corp.. (KNK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Beazer East, Inc., Stella-Jones Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Vance Brothers, Inc., The Brewer Company. filed by City of Apple Valley. Filer requests summons issued. (Shulman, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Stella-Jones Corporations parent corporation is Stella-Jones U.S. Holding Corporation. Stella-Jones U.S. Holding Corporation is owned by Stella-Jones Inc., which is a Canadian Corporation and is publicly traded on the Toronto Stock Exchange. (Anstoetter, Mark) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (kt).
February 7, 2019 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain CII Carbon LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain Commodities (USA) Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Rain Carbon Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain Carbon Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Rain Carbon Holdings LLC. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER on #36 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2019. (MSK)
February 5, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 2/5/2019. (MSK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John K Sherk, III for Stella-Jones Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christina M. Carroll for Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc. and for Ruetgers Canada Inc..; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky for Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc. and for Ruetgers Canada Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert L Shuftan for Koppers Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 4, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6648080 filed by Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christina M. Carroll. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6648074 filed by Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Robbins on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Robbins, Jennifer)
February 1, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert L. Shuftan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6645380 filed by Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: Plaintiff and Defendants Koppers, Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., and Lone Star Specialty Products ("these Defendants") have filed a joint stipulation seeking to extend the deadline to amend the Complaint up to March 19, 2019, and that the deadline for these Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint would be extended up to May 24, 2019. The Court will consider these requests following a status call on February 5, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Meanwhile, to avoid concern over the current answer deadline for these Defendants, the Court will extend the deadline for Defendants' answer or to otherwise respond until March 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/1/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03501-NEB-BRT et al.(MSK)
January 31, 2019 Filing 37 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #36 Stipulation. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION by Koppers Inc.. Jointly Signed by City of Apple Valley, Minnesota, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Koppers Inc., and Lone Star Specialty Products, LLP. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation served on 1/29/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Stella-Jones Corp. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Rain Carbon Inc. served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Rain Carbon Holdings LLC served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Apple Valley. Koppers Inc. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/31/2019. (MSK)
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John K. Sherk. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6640297 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Anstoetter for Stella-Jones Corp..; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brenton David Dwerlkotte for Stella-Jones Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/31/2019. (NAH)
January 30, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complain filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complain filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Zane A. Umsted on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Umsted, Zane)
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M Muscoplat on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Muscoplat, Joel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURES Rule 7.1 by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC.(Graff, Robert)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Graff on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Graff, Robert)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Koppers Holdings Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Schleicher on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (Schleicher, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE. NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Schleicher on behalf of Koppers Inc. (Schleicher, Steven) Modified text on 1/30/2019 (JLB).
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by D Scott Aberson on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (Aberson, D)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C McCarthy on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Brent Dwerlkotte. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6637219 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Anstoetter. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6637196 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Madel on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-119 (NEB/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/25/2019, Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/29/2019, Donovan W. Frank on 1/25/2019, Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/25/2019 and Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/25/2019. (KNK)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT Amended Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment re #1 Complaint. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nancy Christensen for City of Apple Valley.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robin Lynn Greenwald for City of Apple Valley.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edan Rotenberg for City of Apple Valley. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/22/2019. (JGK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edan Rotenberg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6617427 filed by City of Apple Valley. (Evans, Janet)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robin Greenwald. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6617400 filed by City of Apple Valley. (Evans, Janet)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nancy Christensen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6617356 filed by City of Apple Valley. (Evans, Janet)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-119 (JRT/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/17/2019. (lmb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robin L. Greenwald, Nancy Christensen, Edan Rotenberg as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp. (MMG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-119 JRT/HB. (MMG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6610127) filed by City of Apple Valley. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shulman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Apple Valley v. Koppers Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain Carbon Holdings LLC
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain Carbon Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella-Jones Corp.
Represented By: Brenton David Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Mark Anstoetter
Represented By: Jennifer M Robbins
Represented By: John K Sherk, III
Represented By: Christopher W. Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koppers Inc.
Represented By: Steven L Schleicher
Represented By: Robert L Shuftan
Represented By: Michael C McCarthy
Represented By: D Scott Aberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruetgers Canada Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC
Represented By: Joel M Muscoplat
Represented By: Zane A. Umsted
Represented By: Robert L Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella-Jones Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brewer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonsal American, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Apple Valley
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?