Chowdhury et al v. Hansmeier
Appellant: Booth Sweet, LLP and Sandipan Chowdhury
Appellee: Paul Hansmeier
Case Number: 0:2019cv00156
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Booth Sweet, LLP, Sandipan Chowdhury. (Godfread, Paul)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 Appellee's Response BRIEF by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(lmb) Document QC'd on 3/19/2019 (JGK).
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (cc: Hansmeier) (AKL)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by Booth Sweet, LLP, Sandipan Chowdhury. (Godfread, Paul)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Paul Hansmeier (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JLB) Document QC'd on 2/13/2019 (CLK).
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Booth Sweet, LLP, Sandipan Chowdhury . (Godfread, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. Judge Nancy E. Brasel no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-156 (WMW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/23/2019. (lmb) cc: Hansmeier.
January 24, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (cc: Hansmeier) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (AKL).
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Jason Sweet as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (JLB) cc: Jason Sweet. Modified text on 1/22/2019 (JLB).
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list. Please use case number 19-cv-156 NEB. cc: Sweet and Hansmeier. (JLB)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-42460. Adversary Proceeding number 16-04124. filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order on Appeal, #5 Adversary Docket, #6 Bankruptcy Docket) (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chowdhury et al v. Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Booth Sweet, LLP
Represented By: Paul A. Godfread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sandipan Chowdhury
Represented By: Paul A. Godfread
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?