Johnson v. Brady
Plaintiff: Aimee Johnson
Defendant: Robin Brady
Case Number: 0:2019cv00169
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Briefing ORDER re: #8 Motion to Dismiss/General. Response to Motion to Dismiss is due by 4/12/2019; Reply is due by 4/26/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/22/2019. (VLM) (cc: Johnson) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (AKL).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Robin Brady to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/21/2019. (KLL) (cc: Johnson) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (AKL).
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Judge Tunheim's chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (KLL) (cc NEF Johnson) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (AKL).
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robin Brady re #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), #11 Meet and Confer Statement, #9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #12 Proposed Order to Judge (Schramm, Tracy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Robin Brady.(Schramm, Tracy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Robin Brady.(Schramm, Tracy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Robin Brady. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schramm, Tracy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) : Date and time to be determined. (Schramm, Tracy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Robin Brady. (Schramm, Tracy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aimee Johnson. Robin Brady served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (AKL) Document QC'd on 3/6/2019 by MMP. Modified text on 3/6/2019 (MMP).
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robin Brady re #5 Notice of Appearance (Schramm, Tracy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A Schramm on behalf of Robin Brady. (Schramm, Tracy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corrected Summons Reissued as to Aimee Johnson. (handed copy of reissued summons to Aimee Johnson at the Duluth Intake Counter)(MMP) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (MMP).
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Summons Issued as to Robin Brady. (JLB) cc: Johnson with service information sheet. Modified text on 1/23/2019 (JLB). Modified text on 1/29/2019 (MMP).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, by Aimee Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 2 of 11, #2 Exhibit part 3 of 11, #3 Exhibit part 4 of 11, #4 Exhibit part 5 of 11, #5 Exhibit part 6 of 11, #6 Exhibit part 7 of 11, #7 Exhibit part 8 of 11, #8 Exhibit part 9 of 11, #9 Exhibit part 10 of 11, #10 Exhibit part 11 of 11)(JLB)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robin Brady (filing fee $400, receipt number 54641001580) filed by Aimee Johnson. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) cc: Aimee Johnson (JLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Brady
Represented By: Tracy A Schramm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?