Mendez v. Paul et al
Plaintiff: Raphael Mendez
Defendant: Entire Mail Room Staffing and David Paul
Case Number: 0:2019cv00183
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court,, filed by Raphael Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT - Plaintiff must file by no later than March 21, 2019, an addendum of no more than two pages explaining what relief he seeks from this action; and if Plaintiff does not file this addendum in the time permitted, this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/6/2019. (VLM) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (MMP). cc: Raphael Mendez. Modified text on 3/8/2019 (MMP).
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Raphael Mendez. (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/28/2019 (KMH).
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Entire Mail Room Staffing, David Paul filed by Raphael Mendez. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (cc: Mendez) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope) (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/28/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Paul et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entire Mail Room Staffing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?