Baker-Ottem v. Goodhue County et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem
Defendant: C.O. John Doe, C.O. Jane Doe, C.O. Steve Schrelber, C.O. Tabitha Manke, Lt. John Doe, Good Hue County, Srg. John Doe and Goodhue County
Case Number: 0:2019cv00186
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 7/12/2019. Motions (disp) due by 8/5/2019. Ready for trial due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/19/2019. (TJB) (cc: Pltf) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (AKL).
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/19/2019. (TJB)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancelation & Resetting of Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (TJB)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Goodhue County, Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. Jointly Signed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem.(Wolf, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #7 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 02/26/2019. (TJB) (cc: Baker-Ottem) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (AKL).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/27/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/5/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Consent Form) (TJB). (cc: Pltf) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (AKL).
January 28, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (cc: NEF Pltf) Modified text on 1/29/2019 (AKL).
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tabitha Manke, Steve Schrelber. (Wolf, Andrew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-186 (WMW/DTS).(lmb) cc: Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem.
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goodhue County. (Wolf, Andrew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Goodhue County, case number 25-cv-18-1771 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6628536) filed by All Defendants. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wolf, Andrew) Modified text on 1/25/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker-Ottem v. Goodhue County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. John Doe
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jane Doe
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Steve Schrelber
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Tabitha Manke
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. John Doe
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Hue County
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srg. John Doe
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodhue County
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Daniel Roy Baker-Ottem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?