Ricketts v. Maggard et al
Plaintiff: David E. Ricketts
Defendant: Jessica Feda, Officer Maggard, B. Birkolz and Dr. Nassaralla
Case Number: 0:2019cv00276
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend - Addendum Capacity Clarification filed by David E. Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(JLB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Bivens Action TORT CLAIM filed by David E. Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(JLB)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER in Response to #13 Plaintiff's Letter concerning service issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/1/2019. (JMK)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER re #8 Report and Recommendation from David Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(JLB) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (JLB). Document QC'd by KMH on 4/1/2019 (KMH).
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to B. Birkolz, Jessica Feda, Maggard. (kt)cc: Ricketts with 3 USM forms per the #9 ORDER. (kt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from David Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/1/2019 (KMH).
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK) (cc: Ricketts) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (AKL).
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/21/2019. (ALM) (cc: Ricketts) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (AKL).
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by David E. Ricketts, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David E. Ricketts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/21/2019. (ALM) (cc: Ricketts) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (AKL).
February 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (cc NEF Ricketts) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (AKL).
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) (cc NEF Ricketts) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (AKL).
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint. Cover Letter added to this entry re: payment. (KNK)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 44641101910 in the amount of $400.00 issued to David Ricketts. (JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/11/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF CLAIM as to David E. Ricketts. (KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: #1 Scanned Envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 2/8/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David E. Ricketts.(KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/8/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David E. Ricketts. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/8/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Protective Order filed by David E. Ricketts. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/8/2019 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against B. Birkolz, Jessica Feda, Maggard, Nassaralla (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-01910) filed by David E. Ricketts. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits: Statement of the Claim, #3 Exhibits: Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death). cc: Ricketts. (KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #4 Cover Letter) (KNK). Document QC'd by KMH on 2/8/2019 (KMH). Modified text on 4/1/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricketts v. Maggard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Feda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Maggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Birkolz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nassaralla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?