Weibel v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Weibel
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00293
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Trevor Weibel (Chester, Anthony)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trevor Weibel (Chester, Anthony)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time. The time for defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to answer or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint in the above-entitled matter is extended to and including April 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/4/2019. (JMK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Extension of Time) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Trevor Weibel. (Savran, Jessica)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Trevor Weibel. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 2/7/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Chester, Anthony)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (AKL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19cv293 PJS/HB. (AKL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6657561) filed by Trevor Weibel. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weibel v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Weibel
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?