Glover v. Rodriquez et al
Plaintiff: Wilbert Glover
Defendant: Joe Paget, R. Paul, Alberts Ross, Tom Roy, Matt Bostrom, Richard Rodriquez, Greg Croucher and Officer Hendrikt
Case Number: 0:2019cv00304
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Becky R Thorson
3 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case No. 19cv304 (ECT/TNL) be assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson, nunc pro tunc, by use of a card from the appropriate deck in the automated case assignment system. The Clerkof Court is directed to reuse a card from the same deck from which the original assignment was made pursuant to the Courts Assignment of Cases order filed July 5, 2017. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a copy of this order shall be filed in each of the above respective files.Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 3/26/2019 and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/27/2019.(AKL) (cc: Glover) Modified text on 3/27/2019 (AKL).
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 34641015469 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Wilbert Glover. See Letter #5 and Order #3 . (MMP) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (lmb).
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Wilbert Glover re: correct OID# and partial filing fee payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Matt Bostrom, Greg Croucher, Joe Paget, R. Paul, Richard Rodriquez, Alberts Ross, Tom Roy, Officer Hendrikt, filed by Wilbert Glover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)). Complaint and Exhibits originally filed at entry #1 have been divided, rescanned, and filed per Order #3 filed on 3/8/2019. (lmb)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Wilbert Glover. 1. Plaintiff Wilbert Glover must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $4.50 within 20 days of the date of this order. 2. Should Glover fail to pay the initial partial filing fee, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to add "Officer Hendrikt" to the caption of the docket in order to clarify his status as a defendant to this litigation. 4. The Clerk of Court is directed to create a new docket entry for Glover's pleading as set forth herein above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/8/2019. (EB) cc: Wilbert Glover. Modified text on 3/8/2019 (lmb).
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Wilbert Glover. (JLB) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/12/19 (KMH).
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Matt Bostrom, Greg Croucher, Joe Paget, R. Paul, Richard Rodriquez, Alberts Ross, Tom Roy filed by Wilbert Glover. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JLB) cc: Plaintiff. Modified text on 2/11/2019 (JLB). Document QC'd by KMH on 2/12/19 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Rodriquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Paget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberts Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Croucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hendrikt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?