Huber v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Analia Y. Huber
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv00315
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-only) ORDER on #21 Stipulation: Defendant United States of America shall have through April 24, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 3/11/2019. (GFK)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation for Extension of Time #21 Stipulation. (Tweeten, Andrew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Analia Y. Huber. (Tweeten, Andrew)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brewster S. Rawls for Analia Y. Huber; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr for Analia Y. Huber. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 2/28/2019. (NAH)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Glen H. Sturtevant Jr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6695969 filed by Analia Y. Huber. (Krause, Benjamin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brewster S. Rawls. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6695945 filed by Analia Y. Huber. (Krause, Benjamin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L Krause on behalf of Analia Y. Huber. (Krause, Benjamin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of United States of America. (Tweeten, Andrew)
February 12, 2019 ENTRY ENTERED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE. (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (LEG).
February 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Brewster S. Rawls, Glen H. Sturtevant, Vanessa Lee Brice, Yohance Asim Pettis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)cc: Brewster S. Rawls, Glen H. Sturtevant, Vanessa Lee Brice, Yohance Asim Pettis. (kt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:18-cv-02850. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau per 3rd/4th Master List.
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the District of Minnesota and, after transfer is effected, to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/8/2019. (CCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue. The Movant United States should coordinate with the local Clerk's office to accomplish the venue transfer. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/8/2019. (Jung, William) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by United States of America. (Pettis, Yohance) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
January 10, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by Brewster Rawls and Glen Sturtevant as Analia Y. Huber (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number TPA054828.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Brewster Rawls and Glen Sturtevant to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brewster Rawls and Glen Sturtevant. If counsel have not already done so, within 10 days hereof, they shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/9/2019. (AHA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Brewster Rawls and Glen Sturtevant to appear pro hac vice by Analia Y. Huber. (Brice, Vanessa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Analia Y. Huber. (Brice, Vanessa) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 *** Terminated- Counsel notified to re-file using the proper event Response to Order to Show Cause *** RESPONSE re 4 Order to show cause by Analia Y. Huber. (Brice, Vanessa) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 12/13/2018 (KMM). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Analia Y. Huber. (Brice, Vanessa) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Analia Y. Huber. Related case(s): no (Brice, Vanessa) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Glen H. Sturtevant is not permitted to practice in the Middle District of Florida. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to show cause, in writing, why his appearance should not be stricken for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.01(a). Counsel has until January 2, 2019, to comply with this Order. Failure to do so will result in counsel's appearance being stricken from the record without further notice from the Court. Further, upon review of the file, the Court finds that the named counsel has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by January 2, 2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/6/2018. (SAO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/27/2018. (SAO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America by serving U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (KMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA-54223 filed by Analia Y. Huber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 2/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huber v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analia Y. Huber
Represented By: Glen Howard Sturtevant, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin L Krause
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?