Jaramillo Jacquez v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Joel L. Brott, Matthew G Whitaker, Peter Berg, Joel Brott, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 0:2019cv00337
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/28/2019. (RMM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Siekert, Friedrich)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Peter Berg, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Jointly Signed by Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez and Joel Brott. (Siekert, Friedrich)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED. STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Peter Berg, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Jointly Signed by Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez and Joel Brott. (Siekert, Friedrich) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (lmb).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Benjamin Mark Moss for Peter Berg, Joel Brott, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, and for Matthew G. Whitaker. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/19/2019. (NAH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Benjamin Mark Moss filed by Peter Berg, Joel Brott, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (JGK)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez. (Brown, Hannah)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric C. Tostrud: Status Conference held on 2/14/2019. The Court ordered: Respondents are to file a response to the Petition #1 on or before Tuesday, February 19 at 12:00 p.m. Respondents need not file a response, however, if before that deadline, the parties file a joint pleading stating that they have made all arrangements necessary to provide the healthcare sought by Petitioner, including all necessary appointments, travel, and other logistical arrangements. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (RMM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 (TEXT ONLY) NOTICE OF TELEPHONE HEARING set for 2/14/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. Instructions for joining the call have been sent separately to counsel. (RMM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of Peter Berg, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Siekert, Friedrich)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-337 ECT/LIB. (kt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Brown on behalf of Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez. (Brown, Hannah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Hannah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-6665337) filed by Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaramillo Jacquez v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel L. Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Benjamin Mark Moss
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Brott
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Benjamin Mark Moss
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Benjamin Mark Moss
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Benjamin Mark Moss
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Benjamin Mark Moss
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Friedrich A. P. Siekert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Melissa Jaramillo Jacquez
Represented By: Hannah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?