ecoNugenics, Inc. v. Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ecoNugenics, Inc.
Defendant: Chengzhi Life Sciences Company, Ltd., Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co., Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. and Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co., Ltd
Case Number: 0:2019cv00351
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to request to submit documents for in camera review #28 . The request is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 04/12/2019. (TJB)
April 5, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #25 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #18 Order/Notice to Attorney filed by Bioenergy Life Science, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Swenson, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Request for no Further Electronic Notices (Sztainer, Taylor)
March 29, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for ecoNugenics, Inc.. (Kelber, Steven)
March 28, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE re #24 Brief filed by Bioenergy Life Science, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) A-E)(Swenson, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 29 (Text-only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Court has received Plaintiff's request for in camera review of costs and fees. If the Court requires additional documents as part if the review, it will notify the parties. (AJS)
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF re #18 Order/Notice to Attorney Requesting In Camera Review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kelber, Steven)
March 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Cotter on behalf of Bioenergy Life Science, Inc.. (Cotter, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE/CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by ecoNugenics, Inc. Certificate of Compliance (Kelber, Steven) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (MMG).
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re #18 Order/Notice to Attorney filed by Plaintiff. (Kelber, Steven) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (kt).
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF re #18 Order/Notice to Attorney Supplemental Verified Brief on Contempt filed by Plaintiff. (Kelber, Steven) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (kt).
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #22 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Swenson, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing held on 3-8-19 before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (EDD)
March 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (EDD)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #17 Show Cause Hearing to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Kelber, Steven)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #17 Show Cause Hearing to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Sztainer, Taylor)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY re Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/8/2019. (AJS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Show Cause Hearing held on 3/8/2019. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (AJS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Reissued as to Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co., Ltd. (kt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by ecoNugenics, Inc. of Response to Show Cause Order (Kelber, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. answer due 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/26/2019. (TJB)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/22/2019. (TJB)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Bioenergy Life Science, Inc..(Swenson, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Bioenergy Life Science, Inc.. (Swenson, David)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-351 (JNE/DTS). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/21/2019. (MMP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by ecoNugenics, Inc. re #8 Notice (Other) (Kelber, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. of Related Cases (Swenson, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ecoNugenics, Inc.. Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Sztainer, Taylor)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven B. Kelber for ecoNugenics, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/14/2019. (NAH)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Sztainer, Taylor)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bioenergy Life Science, Inc., Chengzhi Life Sciences Company, Ltd., Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co.. (kt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-351 ECT/ECW. (kt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven B. Kelber. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6669820 filed by ecoNugenics, Inc.. (Sztainer, Taylor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6669738) filed by ecoNugenics, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sztainer, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ecoNugenics, Inc. v. Bioenergy Life Science, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chengzhi Life Sciences Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioenergy Life Science, Inc.
Represented By: David P Swenson
Represented By: John A Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Gold Kropn Biotechnology Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ecoNugenics, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor D Sztainer
Represented By: Steven B. Kelber
Represented By: William M Topka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?