Gunderson v. Bayer Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline D. Gunderson
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc., Bayer AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 0:2019cv00368
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at: #http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml. (lmb)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/25/2016. (lmb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:18-cv-17791. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List.
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-147) transferring case to the USDC for the District of Minnesota. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/15/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK & CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/15/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/15/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, MERCK & CO., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9272531) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACQUELINE D. GUNDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DWECK, MORRIS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 2/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunderson v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline D. Gunderson
Represented By: MORRIS S. DWECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?