Boone v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Russell Boone
Defendant: Aero Technologies, LLC, 3M Company and Aearo Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00389
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim for all further proceedings. Judge Donovan W. Frank no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-389 (JRT/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Judge David S. Doty and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 2/21/2019, by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 2/22/2019, and by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/25/2019. (lmb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-389 (DWF/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/20/2019. (lmb)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-389 (DWF/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/20/2019. (lmb) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (lmb).
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robert Hilliard, Rudy Gonzales, Jr., John B. Martinez, Marion M. Reilly, Aurora Blackwelder-Baggett as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd, 4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-389 (DWF/ECW). (MMP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aero Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6678346) filed by Russell Boone. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schafer, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Boone
Represented By: Brent S Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?