United States of America v. $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244
Case Number: 0:2019cv00421
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM Returned Executed on 3/4/2019 as to $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 3/12/2019 (KMH).
February 27, 2019 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-421 (JNE/HB). (lmb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244 filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hudleston, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,135.78 Seized From Bank of America Account Nos. 488077469759 and 381051356244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah E. Hudleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?