Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bismarck Williams
Defendant: Citifinancial Management Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00480
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Equifax Information Services LLC by Bismarck Williams (Chester, Anthony)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/23/2019. (TJB)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Extension of Time) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Bismarck Williams. (Savran, Jessica)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 04/02/2019. (TJB)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Extension of Time) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Bismarck Williams. (Savran, Jessica)
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bismarck Williams. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Chester, Anthony)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CitiFinancial Management Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (MMG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-480 JNE/DTS. (MMG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6696373) filed by Bismarck Williams. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chester, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citifinancial Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Z Savran
Represented By: Charles F Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bismarck Williams
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?