Ratcliff v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co. et al
Plaintiff: James L. Ratcliff
Defendant: UMC Equipment, LLC, John Doe, Mary Roe, Ochsner Partnership, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, XYZ Partnership, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co, ABC Corporation and Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00512
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Sater, Jesse)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation has until April 11, 2019 to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/27/2019. (HAM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Sater, Jesse)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Jointly Signed by James Ratcliff. (Sater, Jesse)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT UMC EQUIPMENT, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/27/2019. (las)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James L. Ratcliff (Dokken, Craig)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Haag, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W Haag on behalf of Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.. (Haag, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT OCHSNER PARTNERSHIP ONLY. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/25/2019. (las)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James L. Ratcliff (Dokken, Craig)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED/WRONG EVENT - NOTICE by James L. Ratcliff Rule 41(a)(1)(A) Dismissal of Defendant Ochsner Partnership (Dokken, Craig) Modified text on 3/22/2019 (las).
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Ratcliff. Ochsner Partnership served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Dokken, Craig)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Ratcliff. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation served on 3/3/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Dokken, Craig)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Ratcliff. UMC Equipment, LLC served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Dokken, Craig)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James L. Ratcliff. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co. served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Dokken, Craig)
March 4, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ABC Corporation, John Doe, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Ochsner Partnership, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., Mary Roe, UMC Equipment, LLC, XYZ Partnership. (JLB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-512 (DWF/TNL). (JLB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6705105) filed by James L. Ratcliff. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dokken, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMC Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Jesse E Sater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.
Represented By: Michael W Haag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Ratcliff
Represented By: Craig T Dokken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?