Dalton v. JJSC Properties, LLC

Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Defendant: JJSC Properties, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00522
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint (as it relates to #25 defendant's amended memorandum filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Browne, Padraigin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Julee Quarve-Peterson in OPPOSITION TO #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-1, #2 Exhibit(s) A-2, #3 Exhibit(s) A-3)(Sieben, Amy)
April 29, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sieben, Amy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 26 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Amy M. Sieben in SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) L)(Sieben, Amy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sieben, Amy)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on #22 Stipulation re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due by 4/30/2019. Reply due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/15/2019. (SMD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Stipulation. (Browne, Padraigin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Re Amendment to Motion to Dismiss by Aaron Dalton. Jointly Signed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Browne, Padraigin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED. MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3)(Sieben, Amy) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (CLK).
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton.(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton.(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Peter Hansmeier in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton.(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Aaron Dalton in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Padraigin Browne in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aaron Dalton. (Browne, Padraigin)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by JJSC Properties, LLC re #10 Reply. (Sieben, Amy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Amy M. Sieben in SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint in support of JJSC Reply Memorandum filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B3)(Sieben, Amy)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY re #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by JJSC Properties, LLC.(Sieben, Amy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Padraigin L. Browne in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Browne, Padraigin)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aaron Dalton. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Browne, Padraigin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JJSC Properties, LLC. (Sieben, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re JJSC Properties, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (Sieben, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sieben, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Sieben, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. (Sieben, Amy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-522 (SRN/DTS). (JLB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6707038) filed by JJSC Properties, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Sieben, Amy) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (JLB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. JJSC Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJSC Properties, LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?