Boitnott v. City of St. Paul, Minnesota

Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: City of St. Paul, Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2019cv00534
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Jerald Boitnott.(Michenfelder, Patrick)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of St. Paul, Minnesota. (Hayes, Lawrence)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald Bruce Carlson for Jerald Boitnott; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Patrick McGraw, III for Jerald Boitnott; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryan Fox for Jerald Boitnott; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelly Iverson for Jerald Boitnott. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/12/2019. (NAH)
March 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly K. Iverson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6724389 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan A. Fox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6724376 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. McGraw, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6724367 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Bruce Carlson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6724337 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-534 (WMW/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/7/2019. (MMP)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerald Boitnott. City of St. Paul, Minnesota served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing R. Bruce Carlson, Kelly K. Iverson, and Bryan A. Fox as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of St. Paul, Minnesota. (MMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th, Civil Rights Housing/Acc. ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-534 (JRT/DTS). (MMP) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (MMP).
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of St. Paul, Minnesota (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6710375) filed by Jerald Boitnott. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michenfelder, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. City of St. Paul, Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Bryan Fox
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kelly Iverson
Represented By: James Patrick McGraw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul, Minnesota
Represented By: Lawrence J Hayes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?