Boitnott v. Brinker International, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: Brinker International, Inc. and ERJ Dining IV, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00538
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph J. Lynett for Brinker International, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/18/2019. (NAH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph J. Lynett. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BMNDC-6816774 filed by Brinker International, Inc.. (Janeiro, Gina)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on #18 Stipulation. ERJ Dining IV, LLC answer due 5/17/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/17/2019. (TMA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Ahmann, Chelsea)
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by ERJ Dining IV, LLC. Jointly Signed by Jerald Boitnott. (Ahmann, Chelsea)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Brinker International, Inc. answer due 5/17/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/17/2019. (TMA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Janeiro, Gina)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Brinker International, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jerald Boitnott. (Janeiro, Gina)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation - Defendant ERJ Dining IV, LLC shall have until April 17, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff Jerald Boitnotts Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/28/2019. (TMA)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation to Extend Defendant ERJ Dining IV, LLC's Time to Respond to the Complaint #12 Stipulation. (Windler, Joseph)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend DefendantERJ Dining IV, LLC's Time to Respond to the Complaint by ERJ Dining IV, LLC. Jointly Signed by Jerald Boitnott. (Windler, Joseph)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jerald Boitnott OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME (Carlson, Ronald)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerald Boitnott. ERJ Dining IV, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald Bruce Carlson for Jerald Boitnott; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Patrick McGraw, III for Jerald Boitnott; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryan Fox for Jerald Boitnott; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelly Iverson for Jerald Boitnott. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/12/2019. (NAH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly K. Iverson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6723902 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan A. Fox. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6723883 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. McGraw, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6723861 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Bruce Carlson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6723815 filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing R. Bruce Carlson, Kelly K. Iverson, Bryan A. Fox as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brinker International, Inc., ERJ Dining IV, LLC. (MMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th, Civil Rights Housing/Acc. ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-538 (NEB/ECW). (MMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRINKER INTERNATIONAL, INC., ERJ Dining IV, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6710884) filed by Jerald Boitnott. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michenfelder, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. Brinker International, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker International, Inc.
Represented By: Gina K Janeiro
Represented By: Joseph J. Lynett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERJ Dining IV, LLC
Represented By: Chelsea Ahmann
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Bryan Fox
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kelly Iverson
Represented By: James Patrick McGraw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?