Big Beings USA PTY Ltd et al v. Halo Innovations, Inc.

Plaintiff: LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS, BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD and LB Online & Export PTY Ltd
Defendant: Halo Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv00759
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 06/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiffs' REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Big Beings USA PTY Ltd, LB Online & Export PTY Ltd. (North, John)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Big Beings USA PTY Ltd, LB Online & Export PTY Ltd. filed by Halo Innovations, Inc.. (Olson, Alexandra)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. Halo Innovations, Inc. answer due 5/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/9/2019. (TJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Olson, Alexandra)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Halo Innovations, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Big Beings USA PTY Ltd and LB Online & Export PTY. (Olson, Alexandra)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Big Beings USA PTY Ltd, LB Online & Export PTY Ltd. Halo Innovations, Inc. served on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven Grant Hill for Big Beings USA PTY Ltd and for LB Online & Export PTY Ltd; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Douglas Kertscher for Big Beings USA PTY Ltd and for LB Online & Export PTY Ltd; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John North for Big Beings USA PTY Ltd and for LB Online & Export PTY Ltd. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/20/2019. (NAH)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Halo Innovations, Inc.. (MMG)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-759 NEB/DTS. (MMG)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John L. North. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6745298 filed by BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD, LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Douglas R. Kertscher. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6745263 filed by BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD, LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven G. Hill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6745242 filed by BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD, LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Reagan Florence on behalf of BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD, LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD, LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS. (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Florence, L. Reagan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Halo Innovations, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6744329) filed by Big Beings USA PTY Ltd, LB Online & Export PTY Ltd Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Florence, L. Reagan) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Beings USA PTY Ltd et al v. Halo Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halo Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Goggin
Represented By: Alexandra J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LB ONLINE & EXPORT PTY LTD (D/B/A LOVE TO DREAM ONLINE AND EXPORTS
Represented By: L. Reagan Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIG BEINGS USA PTY LTD
Represented By: L. Reagan Florence
Represented By: Steven Grant Hill
Represented By: Alan M Anderson
Represented By: Douglas Kertscher
Represented By: John North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LB Online & Export PTY Ltd
Represented By: Steven Grant Hill
Represented By: Alan M Anderson
Represented By: Douglas Kertscher
Represented By: John North
Represented By: L. Reagan Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?