Dalton v. Gaudette Properties, LLC

Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Defendant: Gaudette Properties, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv00779
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Peschel, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Gaudette Properties, LLC. Jointly Signed by Aaron Dalton. (Peschel, Mark)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/16/2019. (HAM)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 10/1/2019. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/16/2019. (HAM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/16/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Gaudette Properties, LLC. Jointly Signed by Aaron Dalton.(Peschel, Mark)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference is now set for 5/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Gaudette Properties, LLC. (Peschel, Mark)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Peschel on behalf of Gaudette Properties, LLC. (Peschel, Mark)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Gaudette Properties, LLC. (Peschel, Mark)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gaudette Properties, LLC. (lmb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-779 NEB/TNL. (lmb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gaudette Properties, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6749245) filed by Aaron Dalton. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Gaudette Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dalton
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaudette Properties, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Peschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?