United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mack et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Lawrence C. Blaney and Jeffrey C. Mack
Case Number: 0:2019cv00918
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by United States Securities and Exchange Commission Re Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Hutton, Doressia)
September 11, 2019 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey C. Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Quinn, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission.(Hutton, Doressia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. The Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/19 is cancelled and scheduling will now be decided on the submissions. 26F reports shall be due in Chambers on or before 9/11/2019. (JEP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:40 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Steinlage, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Lawrence Blaney's Motion to Dismiss #20 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 7/23/2019. (LLM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2019 re #20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lawrence C. Blaney, argued, taken under advisement. Present: Doressia Hutton and Kristopher Heston for Plaintiff; Michael Quinn, Michael Steinlage and Mack Reed for Defendants. (ct60min) (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (JEP)
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY re #22 Proposed Order to Judge, #20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General , #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinlage, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hutton, Doressia)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Quinn for Lawrence C. Blaney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/14/2019. (NAH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Joseph Quinn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6931682 filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Steinlage, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael J. Quinn as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lawrence C. Blaney.(Steinlage, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinlage, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Steinlage, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jeffrey C. Mack. (Reed, Mack)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Steinlage, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Lawrence C. Blaney. (Steinlage, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Steinlage on behalf of Lawrence C. Blaney. (Steinlage, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Premo on behalf of Jeffrey C. Mack. (Premo, Stephen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Madel on behalf of Jeffrey C. Mack. (Madel, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mack H Reed on behalf of Jeffrey C. Mack. (Reed, Mack)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Lawrence C. Blaney waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Jeffrey C. Mack waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Kristopher S Heston for United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/4/2019. (JGK)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Kristopher Shane Heston filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (JGK)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Doressia LaShun Hutton for United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 4/4/2019. (JGK)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Doressia LaShun Hutton filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (JGK)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Doressia L. Hutton; Kristopher S. Heston as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lawrence C. Blaney, Jeffrey C. Mack. (lmb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-918 (PAM/ECW). (lmb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John E Birkenheier on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Birkenheier, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Birkenheier, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Represented By: John E Birkenheier
Represented By: Doressia LaShun Hutton
Represented By: Kristopher S Heston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence C. Blaney
Represented By: Kelly A Lelo
Represented By: Michael J. Quinn
Represented By: Michael J Steinlage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Mack
Represented By: Christopher W. Madel
Represented By: Mack H Reed
Represented By: Stephen M Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?