Clervrain v. Dayton et al
Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Defendant: Mark Dayton, Lori R. Swanson, John Sandweg and Steve Simon
Case Number: 0:2019cv00965
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER/REQUEST for Extension by Manetirony Clervrain. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 5/24/2019 (MKB).
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Manetirony Clervrain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/8/2019. (JMK) cc: Clervrain. (kt)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) cc: Manetirony Clervrain. Modified text on 4/17/2019 (JLB).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/10/2019. (ALM) cc: Manetirony Clervrain. Modified text on 4/11/2019 (JLB).
April 9, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Manetirony Clervrain. Modified text on 4/9/2019 (JLB).
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR DEPRIVATIZATION THE PRISON INDUSTRY BY ILLEGAL CONTRACT filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (CLK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR EXPANDING THE NATIONALITY CHOICE ACT filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (CLK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION FOR INDIGENCY FINANCIAL BURDENS ACT filed by Manetirony Clervrain.(CLK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR INDIGENCY FINANCIAL BURDENS ACT filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (CLK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (CLK)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Mark Dayton, John Sandweg, Steve Simon, Lori R. Swanson filed by Manetirony Clervrain. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) cc: Clervrain. (CLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clervrain v. Dayton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori R. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sandweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?