Beatty v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mataisha Beatty
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv00990
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 12/12/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/6/2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 9/13/2019. Motions (disp) due by 2/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 4/1/2020. Telephone Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff, Mataisha Beatty.(Bengs, Tina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Bengs, Tina)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tina Marie Bengs for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/17/2019. (NAH)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tina M. Bengs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6876386 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hoffmann, Kathleen)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hoffmann on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hoffmann, Kathleen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MMG)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-990 PAM/BRT. (MMG)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6798051) filed by Mataisha Beatty. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beatty v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Tina Marie Bengs
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mataisha Beatty
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?