Robertson v. Marques

Petitioner: Edward S. Robertson
Respondent: R. Marques
Case Number: 0:2019cv01009
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #23 Certificate of Service: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward S. Robertson re #22 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION to Reconsider or Correct Judgment re #20 Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/10/2019 (KMH).
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Edward S. Robertson in SUPPORT OF #21 MOTION to Reconsider or Correct Judgment re #20 Judgment, filed by Edward S. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2-3)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/10/2019 (KMH).
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Reconsider or Correct Judgment re #20 Judgment, filed by Edward S. Robertson. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/10/2019 (KMH).
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #16 Certificate of Service: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 JUDGMENT. cc: Edward S. Robertson with Appeal Packet (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(ACH)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The May 8, 2019 R&R of United States Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau #13 is ADOPTED. Petitioner Edward S. Robertson's petition for a writ of habeas corpus #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 6/13/2019. (RJE) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (ACH). cc: Edward S. Robertson
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #15 , #13 Report and Recommendation filed by R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Secord, Erin)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The emergency motion of Petitioner Edward S. Robertson #14 to expedite the proceedings in this case is GRANTED. Respondent R. Marques is ordered to file any response to Petitioner's objection #15 on or before May 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 5/23/2019. (DAC) cc: Robertson. Modified text on 5/23/2019 (JME).
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward S. Robertson re #14 MOTION to Expedite, #15 Objection to Report and Recommendations (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH).
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendations filed by Edward S. Robertson. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH).
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXPEDITE filed by Edward S. Robertson. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/18/2019 (KMH).
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending dismissing without prejudice #1 Robertson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, and granting #11 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Edward S. Robertson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 5/8/2019. (GFK) cc: Robertson on 5/10/2019 (KNK).
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward S. Robertson re #10 Reply, #11 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/16/2019 (KMH).
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED RULING filed by Edward S. Robertson. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/16/2019 (KMH).
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 PETITIONER'S REPLY TO WARDEN'S RESPONSE re #7 Response filed by Edward S. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/16/2019 (KMH).
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Marques re #7 Response, #8 Declaration (Secord, Erin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #7 Response by R. Marques . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Secord, Erin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Secord, Erin)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED. RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Secord, Erin) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (KNK).
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Secord on behalf of R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Secord, Erin)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent's answer to the petition is due 14 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's reply is due 7 days from the date the answer is filed. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 4/16/2019. (MME)cc: Robertson on 4/17/2019 (KNK).
April 15, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Edward Robertson on 4/15/2019 (KNK).
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward S. Robertson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Memorandum (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/22/2019 (KMH).
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edward S. Robertson.(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/22/2019 (KMH).
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 44641102769) filed by Edward S. Robertson. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc:Robertson (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/22/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward S. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Marques
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Erin M Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?