Adams v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The

Plaintiff: Melinda Adams
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv01014
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The answer due 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/13/2019. (JMK)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Answer. (Schmoll, Zachary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Melinda Adams. (Schmoll, Zachary)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Melinda Adams. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Schmoll, Zachary)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/16/2019. (CLB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (MMP)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1014 (DSD/HB). (MMP)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6803848) filed by Melinda Adams. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schmoll, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Adams
Represented By: Zachary Schmoll
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?