Araujo v. Rios
Petitioner: Norberto Araujo
Respondent: Warden M. Rios
Case Number: 0:2019cv01015
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/31/2019. (JMK) cc: Aroujo. Modified text on 5/31/2019 (JLB).
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Warden M. Rios re #9 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #7 Response (Secord, Erin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Shannon Boldt re #7 Response by Warden M. Rios . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Secord, Erin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Misty Jones re #7 Response by Warden M. Rios . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Secord, Erin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Warden M. Rios. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Secord, Erin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT number 44641102957 in the amount of $5 issued to Norberto Araujo. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/1/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Secord on behalf of Warden M. Rios. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Secord, Erin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Secord on behalf of Warden M. Rios. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Secord, Erin) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (MMP).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent is directed to file an answer to Norberto Araujos habeas petition within 30 days of this Order. Petitioner's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Doc. No. 2] cannot be granted at this time, as Petitioner has not provided sufficient information from which this Court could conclude that he qualifies financially for in forma pauperis status. Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner must submit financial information establishing his eligibility for in forma pauperis status or, alternatively, pay the $5.00 filing fee for this matter, failing which it will be recommended that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/17/2019. (JMK) cc: Norberto Araujo with IFP application. Modified text on 4/17/2019 (JLB).
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Norberto Araujo. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/22/2019 (KMH).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Norberto Araujo. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) cc: Petitioner. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 4/22/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Araujo v. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden M. Rios
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Erin M Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Norberto Araujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?