Dominguez Hernandez v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Erick Dominguez Hernandez
Respondent: Joel Brott, Ronald Vitiello, Kevin McAleenan, William P. Barr, Peter Berg, Ronald D. Vitiello and William Barr
Case Number: 0:2019cv01019
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/5/2019. (CBC)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Hoskins, Adam)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by William Barr, Peter Berg, Kevin McAleenan, Ronald D. Vitiello. Jointly Signed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Hoskins, Adam)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Reply to Government's Response to Section 2241 Habeas Petition and Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Petitioner's Reply due by 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/29/2019. (JMK)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Response filed 5/13/2019 filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, BIA Decision)(Brown, Hannah)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #16 Exhibit: Scanned in Exhibit 3, p. 31. (KMH)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Eric J. O'Denius re #19 Response,, by William Barr, Peter Berg, Kevin McAleenan, Ronald D. Vitiello . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice & Order of Expedited Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice to Reinstate, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Referral, #4 Exhibit(s) D - IJ Opinion)(Hoskins, Adam)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by William Barr, Peter Berg, Kevin McAleenan, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hoskins, Adam)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: (1) Respondents are directed to file an answer to Erick Dominguez Hernandez's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus [Doc. No. 1] within 21 days of this order certifying the true cause and proper duration of Hernandez's confinement and showing cause why the writ should not be granted in this case; (2) Respondents' Request for Consolidated Briefing Schedule [Doc. No. 8] is GRANTED. Respondents may file a consolidated memorandum of law that includes both their answer to the petition and a response to Petitioner's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order; (3) If Petitioner intends to file a reply to Respondents' answer or a reply in support of the Motions for Temporary Restraining Order, he must do so within 14 days of the date of Respondents' consolidated filing. Thereafter, no further submissions from either party will be permitted, except as authorized by Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/22/2019. (JMK)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #3 Scanned in Exhibit 3, p. 31) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 5/14/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/14/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez.(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/14/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez.(MMG) Modified text on 4/19/2019 (MMG). Document QC'd by KMH on 5/14/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/14/2019 (KMH).
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter from ICE)(Brown, Hannah)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez to Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/18/2019. (CBC)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Consolidated Briefing Schedule #8 Request. (Hoskins, Adam)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by William Barr, Peter Berg, Kevin McAleenan, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Hoskins, Adam)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of TRO & Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibits, #4 Supplement Proposed Order -- TRO, #5 Supplement Proposed Order -- Preliminary Injunction)(Brown, Hannah)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of William Barr, Peter Berg, Kevin McAleenan, Ronald D. Vitiello. (Hoskins, Adam)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1019 JNE/HB. (MMG)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Erick Dominguez Hernandez re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Brown, Hannah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Brown on behalf of Erick Dominguez Hernandez. (Brown, Hannah)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-6804787) filed by Erick Dominguez Hernandez. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez Hernandez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Adam J Hoskins
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erick Dominguez Hernandez
Represented By: Hannah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?