Bailey et al v. Metropolitan Council et al

Plaintiff: Marlon Carter, Jeffrey L. Bailey and Marlon E. Carter
Defendant: First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council, Patricia Vold, Troy D. Gustafson, Dean Vinge, Tim Ogren, Don Johnson and Teamsters Local 120
Case Number: 0:2019cv01024
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian Hentosz for First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Dean Vinge and for Patricia Vold. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/10/2019. (JGK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Troy D. Gustafson, Teamsters Local 120 re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #14 Proposed Order to Judge (Joseph, Katrina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Troy D. Gustafson, Teamsters Local 120.(Joseph, Katrina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Troy D. Gustafson, Teamsters Local 120. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Joseph, Katrina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Joseph, Katrina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Troy D. Gustafson, Teamsters Local 120. (Joseph, Katrina)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian M. Hentosz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6984889 filed by First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold. (Robbins, Holly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold re #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian M. Hentosz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6984248. (Robbins, Holly) Modified filers/text on 7/9/2019 (lmb).
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian M. Hentosz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6984248 filed by First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold. (Robbins, Holly) Modified filers/text on 7/9/2019 (lmb). Modified text on 7/9/2019 (JGK).
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED Summons Issued as to First Transit Inc., Troy D. Gustafson, Don Johnson, Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Teamsters Local 120, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold. (ACH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued as to First Transit Inc., Troy D. Gustafson, Don Johnson, Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Teamsters Local 120, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold. (MMP) cc: Marlon E. Carter. Modified text on 6/12/2019 (MMP).
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Transit Inc., Troy D. Gustafson, Don Johnson, Metropolitan Council, Tim Ogren, Teamsters Local 120, Dean Vinge, Patricia Vold. filed by Marlon E. Carter, Jeffrey L. Bailey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #2 Amended Page 4 of Complaint, #3 Amended Page 5 of Complaint) (MMP). Modified text on 6/12/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd on 7/1/2019 (JGK).
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Summons Issued as to First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council. (ACH)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/16/2019. (las)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council. (MMP) cc: Bailey and Carter. Modified text on 4/12/2019 (MMP).
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Transit Inc., Metropolitan Council (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-15502, 3-15503) filed by Jeffrey L. Bailey, Marlon E. Carter. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)cc: pro se plaintiffs. (MMP) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd on 6/4/2019 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Metropolitan Council et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon E. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit Inc.
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Brian Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Council
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Brian Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Vold
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Brian Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy D. Gustafson
Represented By: Katrina E Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Vinge
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Brian Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ogren
Represented By: Holly M Robbins
Represented By: Brian Hentosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 120
Represented By: Katrina E Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?