Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Rymer Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Companies and Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Rymer Companies, LLC, Cannon Falls Mall, Inc. and Rymer Companies
Case Number: 0:2019cv01025
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2019. Expert Discovery due by 2/1/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 12/15/2019. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 8/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/18/2019. (HAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Cincinnati Ins. Co. REPLY to Counterclaim Rymer Companies, LLC et al. filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Kane, Anthony)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Rymer Companies, LLC, a/k/a Rymer Companies, Inc. and Cannon Falls Mall, Inc..(Kane, Anthony)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Vanguard Group, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff Cincinnati Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Kane, Anthony)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Counter Claimant Rymer Companies, LLC. (Hammond, Bradley)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Cannon Falls Mall, Inc. (Hammond, Bradley) Modified text on 5/15/2019 (kt).
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley K Hammond on behalf of All Defendants. (Hammond, Bradley)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley K Hammond on behalf of All Defendants. (Hammond, Bradley)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Rymer Companies, LLC. (Hammond, Bradley)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cincinnati Insurance Company re #2 Complaint, upon Defendant Cannon Falls Mall, Inc., (Kane, Anthony)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cincinnati Insurance Company re #2 Complaint, upon Defendant Rymer Companies, LLC (Kane, Anthony)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1025 ECT/TNL. (CLK)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cannon Falls Mall, Inc., Rymer Companies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6807840) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Companies. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kane, Anthony)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE ENTRY. COMPLAINT against Cannon Falls Mall, Inc., Rymer Companies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6805954) filed by Cincinnati Insurance Companies. No summons requested. (Kane, Anthony) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Rymer Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rymer Companies, LLC
Represented By: Bradley K Hammond
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon Falls Mall, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley K Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rymer Companies
Represented By: Bradley K Hammond
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Companies
Represented By: Anthony J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony J Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?