Walker v. Home Title, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kimberly K Walker and Kimberly K. Walker
Defendant: Home Title, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01214
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly K. Walker re #5 Waiver of Service Executed (Kwan, Benjamin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kimberly K. Walker. Home Title, Inc. waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Kwan, Benjamin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Title, Inc. (MMP)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1214 (SRN/HB). (MMP)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Title, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6855876) filed by Kimberly K Walker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kwan, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Home Title, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly K Walker
Represented By: Benjamin R Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly K. Walker
Represented By: Benjamin R Kwan
Represented By: Ted Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Title, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?