Turek v. Flint HIlls Resources, LP et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Turek
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC, Flint HIlls Resources, LP and Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01215
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 12/5/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/2/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 3/2/2020. Motions (disp) due by 8/3/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2019. (MSK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend LLC. Jointly Signed by Ryan Turek.(Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The pretrial conference is reset to June 28, 2019, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend LLC. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Per counsel request, the Pretrial Conference is reset to 06/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ryan Turek re: Pre-trial Conference. (McEllistrem, Sarah)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/9/2019. (MSK)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to the Amended Complaint by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend LLC. Jointly Signed by Ryan Turek. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/8/2019. (CLB)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1215 DSD/BRT. (CLK)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Koch Industries, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Koch Industries, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Flint HIlls Resources, LP. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-CV-19-1502 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6855976) filed by Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC, Flint HIlls Resources, LP. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Amended Summons and Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kettelkamp, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turek v. Flint HIlls Resources, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC
Represented By: Brent D Kettelkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint HIlls Resources, LP
Represented By: Brent D Kettelkamp
Represented By: Cynthia A Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend LLC
Represented By: Brent D Kettelkamp
Represented By: Cynthia A Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Turek
Represented By: Mark Harrison Gehan
Represented By: Sarah J McEllistrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?