Lurken v. Archer et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer G. Lurken
Defendant: Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Excel Parts L.L.C., Robotics-Redefined, Inc., Reactive Recycling, LLC, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Jacqueline Archer, Fedora Equipment, LLC, Andrew J Archer and Andrew J. Archer
Case Number: 0:2019cv01223
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc. re #15 Meet and Confer Statement, #14 Reply, (Haas, J D)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion for Joinder filed by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc..(Haas, J D)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY re #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-33817. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03101., #10 Objection filed by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc..(Haas, J D)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Reply to the Trustee's Objection to Defendants' Motion to Withdraw filed by Jacqueline Archer. (Brown, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT Exhibit A-Transcript re #11 Response, filed by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C-Statement)(Haas, J D)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 Objection filed by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc. ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Haas, J D) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (MMP).
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION re #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-33817. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03101. filed by Jennifer G. Lurken.(Swedberg, Amy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING: re Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. The hearing on the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference has been scheduled for Monday, September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Nancy E. Brasel in Courtroom 3A of the St. Paul Federal Courthouse. The parties shall refer to the Clerks Notice of Receipt and Assignment #6 for the briefing schedule. (KMW)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Roland Gary Jones for Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC and for Robotics-Redefined, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 5/15/2019. (JGK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Joinder to Motion to Withdraw Reference filed by Jacqueline Archer. (Brown, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (CLK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roland Jones. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6871706 filed by Andrew J. Archer, Archer IP, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Brute Balers L.L.C., Excel Parts L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Fisher Properties, LLC, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Robotics-Redefined, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Haas, J D)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Roland Gary Jones as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancey E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Bankruptcy) list. Please use case number 19-cv-1223 NEB. (CLK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(MAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-33817. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03101. filed by Brute Balers L.L.C., Fedora Equipment, LLC, Andrew J Archer, Reactive Recycling, LLC, Excel Parts L.L.C., Archer IP, LLC, Fisher Properties, LLC, Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC, Fedora Labs Limited, Robotics-Redefined, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Memorandum, #5 Amended Memorandum, #6 Exhibit(s) re Amended Memorandum, #7 Exhibit(s) re Amended Memorandum, #8 Exhibit(s) re Amended Memorandum, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Adv Docket Sheet) (MAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #11 Identification of Residence) (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lurken v. Archer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedora Labs Limited
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Properties, LLC
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Parts L.L.C.
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robotics-Redefined, Inc.
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reactive Recycling, LLC
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer IP, LLC
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Manufacturing Reno, LLC
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brute Balers L.L.C.
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Archer
Represented By: Mark S Brown
Represented By: Perssis Meshkat-Razavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedora Equipment, LLC
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J Archer
Represented By: J D Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Archer
Represented By: J D Haas
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer G. Lurken
Represented By: Amy J Swedberg
Represented By: Jennifer G Lurken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?