Jackson v. Mend Correctional Care et al

Plaintiff: Larry Dion Jackson
Defendant: Mend Correctional Care and Nurse Martha Denzer
Case Number: 0:2019cv01226
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Larry Dion Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 6/17/2019. (MME) cc: Jackson. Modified text on 6/17/2019 (JME).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Larry Dion Jackson. Partial filing fee due within 20 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 5/15/2019. (MME)cc: Jackson. Modified text on 5/16/2019 (CLK).
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry Dion Jackson re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #3 Affidavit, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Larry Dion Jackson. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/29/2019 (KMH).
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Larry Dion Jackson re #1 Prisoner Complaint and #2 Application to Proceed in District Court with Prepayment of Fees filed by Larry Dion Jackson. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/29/2019 (KMH).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Larry Dion Jackson. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 5/29/2019 (KMH).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Martha Denzer, Mend Correctional Care filed by Larry Dion Jackson. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd & 4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (MMP) cc: Jackson. Document QC'd by KMH on 5/29/2019 (KMH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #4 Scanned Envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Mend Correctional Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mend Correctional Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Martha Denzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dion Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?