Carlson v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Jason Carlson
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01232
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 49:20101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 7/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/7/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #1 Consent Form) (TJB). Modified text on 6/10/2019 (CLK).
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant BNSF Railway Company. (Ferguson, Sally)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Ferguson, Sally)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Carlson. BNSF Railway Company served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Bowman, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (KNK)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1232 (WMW/DTS). (KNK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6860948) filed by Jason Carlson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jossart, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Sally J Ferguson
Represented By: Daniel A Haws
Represented By: Allison N. Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Carlson
Represented By: Paula M Jossart
Represented By: John D Magnuson
Represented By: Christopher W Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?