Glover v. Halvorson et al

Petitioner: Wilbert Glover
Respondent: Warden Kathy Halvorson and Keith Ellison
Case Number: 0:2019cv01238
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathy Halvorson re #13 Response, #14 Exhibit (Marker, Peter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT List re #13 Response filed by Kathy Halvorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Marker, Peter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Kathy Halvorson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Marker, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/3/2019. (JLB). Wilbert Glover on 6/4/2019 (KNK).
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathy Halvorson re #10 Notice of Appearance (Marker, Peter)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter R Marker on behalf of Kathy Halvorson. (Marker, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keith Ellison Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keith Ellison re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Notice of Appearance, #7 Proposed Order to Judge (Frank, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison.(Frank, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frank, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General Petition For Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith Ellison. (Frank, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Frank on behalf of Keith Ellison. (Frank, Matthew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT number 34641015545 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Wilbert Glover. (MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/13/2019 (KMH).
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from United States Clerk's Office to Wilbert Glover re: NO FEE/IFP Letter. cc: Glover with IFP form. (MMP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Wilbert Glover. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd & 4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc: Glover. (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Halvorson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilbert Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kathy Halvorson
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Peter R Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?