Chadbourne v. Walmart

Plaintiff: Brian Eugene Chadbourne
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and Walmart
Case Number: 0:2019cv01240
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2019 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (JRE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 Reply to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing re: #4 Motion to Dismiss/General. Motion Hearing reset for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (JRE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Eugene Chadbourne. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing re: #4 Motion to Dismiss/General. Motion Hearing reset for 7/30/2019 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (JRE) cc: Brian Eugene Chadbourne. Modified text on 6/11/2019 (MMP).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 19cv1415 SRN/HB has been reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/3/2019. (MMG) cc:Chadbourne. Modified text on 6/4/2019 (MMG).
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not re-sent to Brian Eugene Chadbourne (MMG) Document QC'd on 5/29/2019 (MKB).
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Mail sent to Brian Eugene Chadbourn returned as undeliverable. (LPH) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/17/2019 (KMH).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER re: #4 Motion to Dismiss/General. Plaintiff's Response due by 6/5/2019. Defendant's Reply due by 6/19/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/14/2019. (JRE) cc: Brian Eugene Chadbourne. Modified text on 5/15/2019 (MMP).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 5/13/2019. (MMG) cc:Brian Eugene Chadbourne. Modified text on 5/14/2019 (MMG).
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schlitz per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1240 PJS/TNL. (MMG)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #7 Declaration in Support, #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #8 Declaration in Support (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #4 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Kinara Williams-Bender in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Katherine L. Nyquist in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc..(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Minnesota, Hennepin County, case number None (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6863465) filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadbourne v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie D Sarantopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Stephanie D Sarantopoulos
Represented By: Katherine Nyquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Eugene Chadbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?