Pritchard v. Marques

Petitioner: Mark Pritchard
Respondent: Warden R. Marques
Case Number: 0:2019cv01242
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: scanned envelope back. (KMH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A Blumenfield on behalf of R. Marques. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Blumenfield, Chad)
May 10, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. cc with practice pointers: Pritchard. (RJE) Modified text on 5/13/2019 (CLK).
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Pritchard re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit (JLB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #2 Memorandum filed by Mark Pritchard.(JLB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mark Pritchard.(JLB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-03135) No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (JLB) cc: NEF to Petitioner.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. Marques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden R. Marques
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Chad A Blumenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?