Fairview Health Services v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.

Plaintiff: Fairview Health Services
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01247
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Eidsness, Kyle)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. There is good cause to delay the entry of a Scheduling Order. A telephone status conference to discuss the schedule is set for July 31, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Counsel should connect and jointly call in to Chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/10/2019. (MSK)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/4/2019. (MSK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/4/2019. (MSK)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Fairview Health Services. Jointly Signed by Cigna Behavioral Health.(Henkel, Timothy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Fairview Health Services. (Henkel, Timothy)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. answer due 6/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/14/2019. (MSK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation,. (Eidsness, Kyle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CIGNA BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC. TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Fairview Health Services. (Eidsness, Kyle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1247(MJD/BRT). (KNK)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6865962) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit of Service) (Eidsness, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairview Health Services v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Alan Eidsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairview Health Services
Represented By: Keith A Patton
Represented By: Timothy J Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?