Johnson v. Covia Holdings Corporation
Plaintiff: Dustin Johnson
Defendant: Covia Holdings Corporation and Unimin Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv01248
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation.(Foix, Danyll)
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation.(Foix, Danyll)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Foix, Danyll)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Foix, Danyll)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Meet and Confer Statement)(Foix, Danyll)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing re Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General: Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen is CANCELLED. (CBC)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court denies as moot Covia Holdings' motion to dismiss [Docket No. #6 ] and cancels the hearing on July 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/10/2019. (CBC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Dustin Johnson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Brandl, Jean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Covia Holdings Corporation. (MMG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for First Amended Complaint Covia Holdings Corporation. (Brandl, Jean)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Covia Holdings Corporation. filed by Dustin Johnson. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #3 Exhibit(s) A-H) (Brandl, Jean) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (LPH).
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation.(Foix, Danyll)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel Endicott for Covia Holdings Corporation; granting #5 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J Guttman for Covia Holdings Corporation. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 5/17/2019. (NAH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Foix, Danyll)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Declaration)(Foix, Danyll)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Meet and Confer Statement, #2 FILED IN ERROR, WILL REFILE SEPARATELY - Proposed Order)(Foix, Danyll) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (KNK).
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Guttman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6877789 filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel Endicott. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6877769 filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Foix, Danyll)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1248 (JNE/DTS). (MMP)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. SCR-Sibelco N.V. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Covia Holdings Corporation. (Foix, Danyll)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Le Sueur County District Court, case number 40-cv-19-434 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6866001) filed by Covia Holdings Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6) (Foix, Danyll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Covia Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covia Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Danyll Foix
Represented By: Samuel Endicott
Represented By: Daniel J Guttman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimin Corporation
Represented By: Danyll Foix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Johnson
Represented By: Jean M Brandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?