Wenneson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Plaintiff: Amanda Jean Wenneson
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01249
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Amanda Jean Wenneson. (Leoni, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1249 ECT/LIB. (MMG)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Cariveau, Nathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Cariveau, Nathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6866182) filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cariveau, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenneson v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Jean Wenneson
Represented By: Joseph F Leoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Nathan T Cariveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?