McCone v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Benton McCone
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01261
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 9/26/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/20/2019. Settlement Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/26/2019. (MSK)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 1/15/2020. Motions (disp) due by 7/8/2020. Ready for trial due by 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/24/2019. (MSK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/19/2019. (MSK)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Jointly signed by Benton McCone. (Angell, Christopher) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (MMG).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/15/2019. (CLB)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19cv1261 DSD/BRT. (JME)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6868605) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Angell, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Angell, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6868548) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit serving Notice of Filing of Removal on Opposing Counsel, #2 Cover Letter Letter serving Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Angell, Christopher) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCone v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher G Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benton McCone
Represented By: Paul K Downes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?