Cirrus Design Corporation v. Fleming

Plaintiff: Cirrus Design Corporation
Defendant: Hoyt Augustus Fleming
Case Number: 0:2019cv01286
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael S Dowler for Hoyt Augustus Fleming. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/12/2019. (JGK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S. Dowler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6987906 filed by Hoyt Augustus Fleming, Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (Huntrods, R)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael S. Dowler as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 5-6 re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim filed by Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 6)(Huntrods, R) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT 4 - Claim Chart re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim filed by Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (Huntrods, R) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 4 - Part D re #9 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim filed by Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (Huntrods, R) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Cirrus Design Corporation. filed by Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Part A, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 - Part B, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4 - Part A, #6 Exhibit(s) 4 - Part B, #7 Exhibit(s) 4 - Part C) (Huntrods, R)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cirrus Design Corporation re #7 Amended Complaint (Wagner, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Hoyt Augustus Fleming. filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Wagner, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. Hoyt Augustus Fleming waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Wagner, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Wagner, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hoyt Augustus Fleming. (JLB)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (5th - Patent) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1286 (JRT/LIB). (JLB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cirrus Design Corporation. (Wagner, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Hoyt Augustus Fleming (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6876017) filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wagner, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cirrus Design Corporation v. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirrus Design Corporation
Represented By: Kevin P Wagner
Represented By: David J F Gross
Represented By: Patrick Bottini
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Augustus Fleming
Represented By: R Ann Huntrods
Represented By: Aaron M Johnson
Represented By: Michael S Dowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?