Aker v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Johanna Aker
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2019cv01298
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Connecticut General Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014.(JEP)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/28/2019. (NAH)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Santos, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6896654 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1298 (PAM/TNL). (MMP)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6879025) filed by Johanna Aker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klotzbuecher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aker v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Alexander M Baggio
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanna Aker
Represented By: Mark Klotzbuecher
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?