Brigham v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Denise Brigham
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01299
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant, Aetna Life Insurance Company (Aetna), pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, makes the following disclosure: 1. Aetna Life Insurance Company is owned, in its entirety, by Aetna Inc. 2. Aetna Inc. is a publicly traded corporation that has no parent corporation. No publicly held corporation(s) owns 10% or more of Aetna Inc.s common stock.(Huhta, Adam) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (MMP).
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Denise Brigham. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Kramer, Patrick)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (MMG)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1299 JNE/SER. (MMG)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6879199) filed by Denise Brigham. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kramer, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brigham v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam S Huhta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Brigham
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Represented By: Patrick Ward Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?