Arias v. Barnes

Petitioner: Esther Arias
Respondent: Warden Nanette Barnes
Case Number: 0:2019cv01326
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nanette Barnes re #9 Declaration, #8 Response (Secord, Erin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Kenneth Craddock re #8 Response by Nanette Barnes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K)(Secord, Erin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nanette Barnes. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Secord, Erin)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER in Response to #4 Request for an extension of time in which to file a response to habeas corpus petition. Response due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/21/2019. cc: Arias. (KAT) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (CLK).
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nanette Barnes re #4 Request, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Secord, Erin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request to Extend Time to Respond to Petition #4 Request. (Secord, Erin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PETITION by Nanette Barnes. (Secord, Erin)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: scanned envelope back (KMH)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Secord on behalf of Nanette Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Secord, Erin)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/24/2019. cc: petitioner. (BJP) Modified text on 5/26/2019 (CLK).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-03229) filed by Esther Arias. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JLB) cc: NEF to petitioner (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 6/17/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias v. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Nanette Barnes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Erin M Secord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esther Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?