Warner v. Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC

Plaintiff: Theresa Warner
Defendant: Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01337
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Ann D Montgomery
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Oliver Acquisition, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC. (Mrachek, Jacqueline)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-01337 ADM/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/13/2019. (KDS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline A Mrachek on behalf of Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC. (Mrachek, Jacqueline)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC. (Mrachek, Jacqueline)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC. (ACH)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Ann D. Montgomery per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1337 ADM/ECW. (ACH)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6889870) filed by Theresa Warner. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Warner
Represented By: Lori C Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Stationstores, Inc./Holiday Stationstores, LLC
Represented By: Terran C Chambers
Represented By: Jacqueline A Mrachek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?