Arrington v. State of Minnesota
Petitioner: Gideon Arrington, II
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2019cv01377
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 - 18, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kelley, Kelsey) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (kt).
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Gideon Arrington, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KDS)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by State of Minnesota (Kelley, Kelsey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Kelsey R. Kelley in SUPPORT OF #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by State of Minnesota.(Kelley, Kelsey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by State of Minnesota. (Kelley, Kelsey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R Kelley on behalf of State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelley, Kelsey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Gideon Arrington, II re: New Forwarding Address Information (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/30/2019. (MSK) CC: Arrington. Modified text on 5/30/2019 (JLB).
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT(S) - re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Gideon Arrington II.(KNK)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gideon Arrington, II. (KNK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2019: #1 Envelope) (KNK).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gideon Arrington, II. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. cc: Arrington (KNK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gideon Arrington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Kelsey R Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?