Landin v. State of Minnesota
Petitioner: Blain Warren Landin
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Case Number: 0:2019cv01405
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying #1 Petitioner Blain Warren Landins Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody. No certificate of appealability shall be issued. Case dismissed without prejudice (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/26/2019. (HAZ)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry W Viesselman on behalf of State of Minnesota. (Viesselman, Terry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Blain Warren Landin. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/28/2019. (TJB) cc: Landin. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (KDS).
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 44641103423 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Warren Landin. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 6/27/2019 (KMH).
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of Minnesota Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Landin re no fee/IFP. CC: Landin with IFP Application. (kt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Blain Warren Landin. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kt) cc: Landin. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landin v. State of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blain Warren Landin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?